LA HB122 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to capital outlay reform (RE DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to capital outlay reform (RE DECREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 122 FINAL PASSAGE (#32) (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-03-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 28. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/18. |
2018-03-14 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018. |
2018-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2018-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |