LA HB1215 | 2012 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB1133
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-16 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to assets of nonprofit organizations affiliated with state institutions of postsecondary education
Title
Provides with respect to assets of nonprofit organizations affiliated with state institutions of postsecondary education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2012. | |
2012-05-11 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-10 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 1133 reported by the Committee on Education (15-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB1133 (Replaces) 2012-05-10 - Becomes HB No. 1215.