LA HB1210 | 2012 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB807
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-15 - Effective date: August 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides ethics exceptions to allow insurance producers providing certain insurance functions and services to governmental entities to receive compensation from other sources
Title
Provides ethics exceptions to allow insurance producers providing certain insurance functions and services to governmental entities to receive compensation from other sources
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Huval [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 1210, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1493) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1210, FINAL PASSAGE (#1562) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1210, FINAL PASSAGE (#821) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1210, FINAL PASSAGE (#1562) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1210, FINAL PASSAGE (#821) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | Effective date: August 1, 2012. | |
2012-06-15 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 864. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-01 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-30 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-30 | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-30 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-05-28 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-05-28 | Rules suspended | |
2012-05-24 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-23 | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-16 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-15 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-14 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-07 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/14/2012. | |
2012-05-07 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-03 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 807 reported by the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs (8-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB807 (Replaces) 2012-05-03 - Becomes HB No. 1210.