LA HB121 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the crime of unlawful restraint of a dog
Title
Provides relative to the crime of unlawful restraint of a dog
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 121 FINAL PASSAGE (#194) (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 121 FINAL PASSAGE (#194) (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 121 FINAL PASSAGE (#194) (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/18. |
2018-03-26 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018. |
2018-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |