LA HB1164 | 2016 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB497
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 33, nays 51. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 33, nays 51. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a task force to study the delivery of integrated physical and behavioral health services for Medicaid enrollees with serious mental illness
Title
Creates a task force to study the delivery of integrated physical and behavioral health services for Medicaid enrollees with serious mental illness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 1164 FINAL PASSAGE (#906) (Y: 33 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 33, nays 51. Failed to pass. |
2016-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016. |
2016-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2016-05-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016. |
2016-05-12 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-11 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 497 reported by the Committee on Health and Welfare (10-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB497 (Replaces) 2016-05-11 - Becomes HB 1164.