LA HB115 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Joint Legislative Committee on Capital Outlay to approve line of credit recommendations for nonstate entity projects (EG NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires the Joint Legislative Committee on Capital Outlay to approve line of credit recommendations for nonstate entity projects (EG NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. John Morris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2016. |
2016-05-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-02 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-02-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/19/2016. |
2016-02-17 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2016-02-17 | House | Prefiled. |