LA HB113 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 36, nays 64. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 36, nays 64. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides that the governor and lieutenant are elected jointly
Title
(Constitutional Amendment) Provides that the governor and lieutenant are elected jointly
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] | Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 113 FINAL PASSAGE (#220) (Y: 36 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 36, nays 64. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/19. |
2019-05-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-04-30 | House | Reported without amendments (5-0). |
2019-04-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-22 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019. |
2019-03-21 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-21 | House | Prefiled. |