LA HB112 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Effective date: May 23, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Effective date: May 23, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes any mayor's court within certain municipalities to increase court costs
Title
Authorizes any mayor's court within certain municipalities to increase court costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 112 FINAL PASSAGE (#437) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 112 FINAL PASSAGE (#160) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - House - House Vote on HB 112 FINAL PASSAGE (#160) (Y: 84 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | House | Effective date: May 23, 2013. |
2013-05-23 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 13. |
2013-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-04-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/29/2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (11-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2013-03-15 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2013. |
2013-03-12 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2013-03-12 | House | Prefiled. |