LA HB111 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the payment of restitution to the victim of a crime
Title
Provides relative to the payment of restitution to the victim of a crime
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-10 - House - House Vote on HB 111 FINAL PASSAGE (#354) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2018-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018. |
2018-02-22 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2018-02-22 | House | Prefiled. |