LA HB111 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-06 - Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-06 - Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits outdoor smoking within 25 feet of certain exterior locations of state buildings
Title
Prohibits outdoor smoking within 25 feet of certain exterior locations of state buildings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 111 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#940) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 111 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#744) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 111 FINAL PASSAGE (#702) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 111 FINAL PASSAGE (#310) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-02 - House - House Vote on HB 111 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#744) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 111 FINAL PASSAGE (#702) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - House - House Vote on HB 111 FINAL PASSAGE (#310) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 2. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Conference committee report received. |
2013-06-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2013-06-03 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Heitmeier, Martiny, and Morrell. |
2013-06-02 | House | House conferees appointed: Hoffmann, Simon, and Pope. |
2013-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 3, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-06-02 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2013-05-30 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/03/2013. |
2013-05-29 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-08 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 11. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/8/2013. |
2013-05-01 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported with amendments (15-1) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-03-15 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2013. |
2013-03-12 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2013-03-12 | House | Prefiled. |