LA HB110 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-20-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-20-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Effective date: 08/01/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a bridge located on Louisiana Highway 154 in Bossier Parish as the "Officer Thomas LaValley Memorial Bridge" (EN +$3,360 SD EX See Note)
Title
Designates a bridge located on Louisiana Highway 154 in Bossier Parish as the "Officer Thomas LaValley Memorial Bridge" (EN +$3,360 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 110 CO-AUTHORS (#459) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 110 FINAL PASSAGE (#458) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 110 FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 110 FINAL PASSAGE (#458) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Vote on HB 110 FINAL PASSAGE (#53) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2016. |
2016-05-09 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 22. |
2016-05-03 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-04-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-03-29 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/2016. |
2016-03-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-03-22 | House | Reported favorably (18-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-02-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/19/2016. |
2016-02-16 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2016-02-16 | House | Prefiled. |