LA HB1085 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes institutions of higher education to develop a pilot program to study the growth, cultivation, or marketing of industrial hemp for agricultural or academic research

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes institutions of higher education to develop a pilot program to study the growth, cultivation, or marketing of industrial hemp for agricultural or academic research

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-26 - House - House Vote on HB 1085 FINAL PASSAGE (#466) (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-28SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2016-04-27SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2016-04-26HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 66, nays 26. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2016-04-21HouseScheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2016.
2016-04-18HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2016-04-14HouseReported favorably (14-0).
2016-04-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
2016-04-05HouseRead by title.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback