LA HB108 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-17 - Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the membership of the Joint Legislative Committee on Capital Outlay
Title
Provides relative to the membership of the Joint Legislative Committee on Capital Outlay
Sponsors
Sen. John Morris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016. |
2016-05-10 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-27 | House | Notice removed |
2016-04-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016. |
2016-04-20 | House | Notice given. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-04-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016. |
2016-04-14 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-13 | House | Reported favorably (8-0). |
2016-03-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-02-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/19/2016. |
2016-02-16 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2016-02-16 | House | Prefiled. |