LA HB1059 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB500
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to contradictory bail hearings for certain persons
Title
Provides relative to contradictory bail hearings for certain persons
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Bacala [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - House - House Vote on HB 1059 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1575) (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1059 FINAL PASSAGE (#1226) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1059 AMENDMENT # 3984 BY MORRIS HB 1059 BY BACALA (#1225) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1059 FINAL PASSAGE (#350) (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1059 FINAL PASSAGE (#350) (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1059 FINAL PASSAGE (#1226) (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1059 AMENDMENT # 3984 BY MORRIS HB 1059 BY BACALA (#1225) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1059 FINAL PASSAGE (#350) (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1059 FINAL PASSAGE (#350) (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | House | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 76, nays 20, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022. |
2022-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-04-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 35. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-04-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/19/2022. |
2022-04-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 500 reported by the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice (9-2). |
Same As/Similar To
HB500 (Replaces) 2022-04-07 - Becomes HB 1059.