LA HB105 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-05 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the functions of the jury commission in Terrebonne Parish
Title
Provides for the functions of the jury commission in Terrebonne Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 105 FINAL PASSAGE (#519) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 105 FINAL PASSAGE (#222) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 105 FINAL PASSAGE (#222) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-05 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 100. |
2013-05-30 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-22 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/1/2013. |
2013-04-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (9-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2013-03-15 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/15/2013. |
2013-03-12 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2013-03-12 | House | Prefiled. |