LA HB104 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Effective date: 08/01/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increases the ceiling on penalties for pipeline safety violations (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the ceiling on penalties for pipeline safety violations (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD RV See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#571) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-28 - House - House Vote on HB 104 FINAL PASSAGE (#159) (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseEffective date: 08/01/2018.
2018-05-10HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 57.
2018-05-01HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-04-27HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2018-04-26SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-04-25SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-04-24SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2018-04-23SenateReported favorably.
2018-04-03SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2018-04-02SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-03-28HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-03-22HouseScheduled for floor debate on 03/28/18.
2018-03-22HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-03-21HouseReported favorably (13-0).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2018-02-23HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018.
2018-02-21HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2018-02-21HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB104&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1065692
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077344
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090695
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096917
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1065694
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1075968
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077939
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078637
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1092549
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1107941
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1080330
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090483

Bill Comments

feedback