LA HB1032 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-25 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Cypress Point Crime Prevention and Improvement District in East Baton Rouge Parish
Title
Creates the Cypress Point Crime Prevention and Improvement District in East Baton Rouge Parish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House Vote on HB 1032 FINAL PASSAGE (#551) (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2016-05-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-04-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2016. |
2016-04-25 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2016-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2016-04-05 | House | Read by title. |