LA HB103 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-41-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Adds Financial Literacy as a required course for high school students (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds Financial Literacy as a required course for high school students (EN INCREASE LF EX See Note)

Sponsors

Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]
Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. Beau Beaullieu [R]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Delisha Boyd [D]
Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]Rep. Marcus Bryant [D]Rep. Rhonda Butler [R]
Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Dewith Carrier [R]Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Wilford Carter [D]
Rep. Mack Cormier [D]Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]
Rep. Daryl Deshotel [R]Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]Rep. Michael Echols [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Les Farnum [R]
Rep. Gabe Firment [R]Rep. Adrian Fisher [D]Rep. Bryan Fontenot [R]Rep. Aimee Freeman [D]
Rep. Barbara Freiberg [R]Rep. Larry Frieman [R]Rep. Foy Gadberry [R]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]
Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. Jonathan Goudeau [R]Rep. Kyle Green [D]
Rep. Lance Harris [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]
Rep. Jason Hughes [D]Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. John Illg [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]
Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Travis Johnson [D]
Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Timothy Kerner [R]Rep. Alonzo Knox [D]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]
Rep. Vanessa Caston Lafleur [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]
Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Danny McCormick [R]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Scott McKnight [R]
Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]
Rep. Buddy Mincey [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]Rep. Richard Nelson [R]Rep. Candace Newell [D]
Rep. Joseph Orgeron [R]Rep. Charles Owen [R]Rep. Robert Owen [R]Rep. Tammy Phelps [D]
Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Thomas Pressly [R]Rep. Neil Riser [R]Rep. Troy Romero [R]
Rep. Rodney Schamerhorn [R]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]Rep. Laurie Schlegel [R]Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]
Rep. Larry Selders [D]Rep. Vincent St. Blanc [R]Rep. Joseph Stagni [R]Rep. Phillip Tarver [R]
Rep. Polly Thomas [R]Rep. Francis Thompson [R]Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Debbie Villio [R]
Rep. William Wheat [R]Rep. Malinda White [R]Rep. Matthew Willard [D]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]
Sen. Mark Abraham [R]Sen. Regina Barrow [D]Sen. Gerald Boudreaux [D]Sen. Joseph Bouie [D]
Sen. Gary Carter [D]Sen. Patrick Connick [R]Sen. Royce Duplessis [D]Sen. Cleo Fields [D]
Sen. Jimmy Harris [D]Sen. Cameron Henry [R]Sen. Sharon Hewitt [R]Sen. Katrina Jackson [D]
Sen. Caleb Kleinpeter [R]Sen. Eddie Lambert [R]Sen. Barry Milligan [R]Sen. Robert Mills [R]
Sen. Beth Mizell [R]Sen. John Morris [R]Sen. Mike Reese [R]Sen. Gary Smith [D]
Sen. Jeremy Stine [R]Sen. Kirk Talbot [R]Sen. Glen Womack [R]

Roll Calls

2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 103 CO-AUTHORS (#775) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 103 FINAL PASSAGE (#774) (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - House - House Vote on HB 103 FINAL PASSAGE (#345) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09HouseEffective date: See Act.
2023-06-09HouseSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 267.
2023-06-07HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2023-06-07SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2023-06-07HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2023-06-05HouseReceived from the Senate without amendments.
2023-06-04SenateRules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 2nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2023-05-26SenateRead by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2023-05-25SenateReported favorably.
2023-05-16SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-05-15SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2023-05-11HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2023-05-04HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2023.
2023-05-03HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2023-05-02HouseReported with amendments (11-0).
2023-04-10HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-03-17HouseFirst appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/17/2023.
2023-03-14HouseUnder the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
2023-03-14HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=23rs&b=HB103&sbi=y
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1303093
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1318233
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1329807
Texthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1332429
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1303834
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1318122
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1303098
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1310463
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1318364
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1318450
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1330672
Supplementhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1333969
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1321654
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1329548
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1329549

Bill Comments

feedback