LA HB1017 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 54. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-18 - Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 54. Failed to pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Bullying Awareness and Treatment Task Force
Title
Creates the Bullying Awareness and Treatment Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - House Vote on HB 1017 FINAL PASSAGE (#905) (Y: 31 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 31, nays 54. Failed to pass. |
2016-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2016-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016. |
2016-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2016-05-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016. |
2016-05-11 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-10 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2016-04-06 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-04-05 | House | Read by title. |