LA HB1015 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-01 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-01 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies with regard to membership on the La. Motor Vehicle Commission
Title
Specifies with regard to membership on the La. Motor Vehicle Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1015, FINAL PASSAGE (#1602) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1015, FINAL PASSAGE (#453) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1015, FINAL PASSAGE (#453) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-31 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-05-22 | Rules suspended | |
2012-05-21 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-17 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-16 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | |
2012-04-24 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | |
2012-04-23 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-04-19 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-12 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/19/2012. | |
2012-04-11 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2012-04-10 | Reported favorably (16-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2012-03-27 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. | |
2012-03-26 | Read by title. |