LA HB1007 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Effective date: August 15, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the La. Governmental Claims Act
Title
Provides relative to the La. Governmental Claims Act
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1007, FINAL PASSAGE (#1345) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1007, FINAL PASSAGE (#499) (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HB 1007, FINAL PASSAGE (#499) (Y: 85 N: 5 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Effective date: August 15, 2010. | |
2010-06-17 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 301. | |
2010-06-14 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2010-06-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-10 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-10 | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-06-04 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2010-06-03 | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-06-02 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | |
2010-05-04 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2010-05-03 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 5. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-04-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on April 29, 2010. | |
2010-04-20 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - local and consent calendar. | |
2010-04-19 | Reported favorably (11-0) (Local and Consent). | |
2010-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-03-19 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | |
2010-03-19 | Prefiled. |