LA HB10 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Louisiana Checkbook website to provide transparency of state fiscal information (Item #32) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Louisiana Checkbook website to provide transparency of state fiscal information (Item #32) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - House - House Vote on HB 10 FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateReceived in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2018-05-30HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-29HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/30/18.
2018-05-29HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-05-29HouseRules suspended.
2018-05-29HouseReported favorably (22-0).
2018-05-25HouseRead by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
2018-05-25HouseDischarged from the Committee on Appropriations.
2018-05-22HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
2018-05-22HousePrefiled.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=182ES&b=HB10&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099956
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101526
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102159
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101875
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100101
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099957
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101798
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101979
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102208
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102323
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1102141

Bill Comments

feedback