LA HB1 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Veto message from the Governor received and read.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-18 - Veto message from the Governor received and read.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Title
Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2023-2024
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 1 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1237) (Y: 95 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 1 PREVIOUS QUESTION (#1236) (Y: 85 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 ADOPT (#1036) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 1 House Rule 6.14 (#1120) (Y: 24 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 1 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1119) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#833) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2347 BY HUGHES MOTION TO ADOPT (#224) (Y: 34 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2362 BY JENKINS MOTION TO ADOPT (#222) (Y: 44 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2366 BY LAFLEUR MOTION TO ADOPT (#223) (Y: 43 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2385 BY MAGEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#226) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2350 BY WILLARD MOTION TO ADOPT (#220) (Y: 33 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#228) (Y: 72 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 SCHEDULE 19-HIGHER EDUCATION (#227) (Y: 71 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 SCHEDULE 18 LA. RETIREMENT SYSTEM (#225) (Y: 71 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2347 BY HUGHES MOTION TO ADOPT (#224) (Y: 33 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2366 BY LAFLEUR MOTION TO ADOPT (#223) (Y: 43 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2362 BY JENKINS MOTION TO ADOPT (#222) (Y: 43 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 MOTION TO ADOPT (#221) (Y: 72 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2350 BY WILLARD MOTION TO ADOPT (#220) (Y: 32 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2338 BY ZERINGUE MOTION TO ADOPT (#218) (Y: 69 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - House Vote on HB 1 PREVIOUS QUESTION (#1236) (Y: 85 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 ADOPT (#1036) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 1 House Rule 6.14 (#1120) (Y: 24 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on HB 1 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1119) (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#833) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2347 BY HUGHES MOTION TO ADOPT (#224) (Y: 34 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2362 BY JENKINS MOTION TO ADOPT (#222) (Y: 44 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2366 BY LAFLEUR MOTION TO ADOPT (#223) (Y: 43 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2385 BY MAGEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#226) (Y: 67 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2350 BY WILLARD MOTION TO ADOPT (#220) (Y: 33 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#228) (Y: 72 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 SCHEDULE 19-HIGHER EDUCATION (#227) (Y: 71 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 SCHEDULE 18 LA. RETIREMENT SYSTEM (#225) (Y: 71 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2347 BY HUGHES MOTION TO ADOPT (#224) (Y: 33 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2366 BY LAFLEUR MOTION TO ADOPT (#223) (Y: 43 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2362 BY JENKINS MOTION TO ADOPT (#222) (Y: 43 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 MOTION TO ADOPT (#221) (Y: 72 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2350 BY WILLARD MOTION TO ADOPT (#220) (Y: 32 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-05-04 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 2338 BY ZERINGUE MOTION TO ADOPT (#218) (Y: 69 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-18 | Senate | Veto message from the Governor received and read. |
2023-07-18 | House | Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules. |
2023-06-29 | House | Effective date: 07/01/2023. |
2023-06-29 | House | Signed by the Governor with one or more line-item vetoes. Becomes Act No. 447. |
2023-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2023. |
2023-06-08 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 9. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 3 nays. |
2023-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-08 | House | Conference Committee report received. |
2023-06-07 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, White, and Tarver. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2023-06-07 | House | House conferees appointed: Zeringue, Schexnayder, and Hughes. |
2023-06-07 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 104, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2023-06-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2023-06-06 | House | Notice given. |
2023-06-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2023-06-06 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/2023. |
2023-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023. |
2023-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2023-05-04 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 33. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2023-05-02 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 1 for 05/04/2023. |
2023-05-02 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-05-01 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). |
2023-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-03-24 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2023-03-24 | House | Prefiled. |