LA HB1 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-28 - Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2018-2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2018-2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-28 - House - House Vote on HB 1 PASS BILL SUBSEQUENT TO VETO (#24) (Y: 52 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 1 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1287) (Y: 62 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 1 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1287) (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on HB 1 LAY ON THE TABLE (#1286) (Y: 34 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#1148) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 4314 BY MILKOVICH HB 1 BY HENRY (#1147) (Y: 3 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 4315 BY MILKOVICH HB 1 BY HENRY (#1146) (Y: 5 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 4316 BY MILKOVICH HB 1 BY HENRY (#1145) (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 4320 BY MILKOVICH HB 1 BY HENRY (#1144) (Y: 5 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1 SCHEDULE 9-DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH (#521) (Y: 58 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3195 BY HARRIS L. MOTION TO ADOPT (#519) (Y: 63 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#522) (Y: 55 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3252 BY CHANEY MOTION TO ADOPT (#520) (Y: 37 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 3195 BY HARRIS L. MOTION TO ADOPT (#519) (Y: 62 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-28HouseRead by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
2018-05-28HouseRead by title. Motion to pass subsequent to Governor's veto failed by a vote of 52 yeas and 48 nays. Motion to reconsider pending.
2018-05-28HouseCalled from the calendar.
2018-05-23HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2018-05-22HouseVeto message received and read. Lies over under the rules. (Hand delivered on 05/18/18.)
2018-05-18HouseSent to the Governor for executive approval.
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-18HouseEnrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-17HouseRead by title, roll called, yeas 62, nays 39, Senate amendments concurred in.
2018-05-16HouseScheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
2018-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate with amendments.
2018-05-15SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2018-05-14SenateRead by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for 5/15.
2018-05-14SenateRules suspended.
2018-05-11SenateReported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-05-11SenateRules suspended.
2018-05-11Senate6
2018-05-11SenateRules suspended.
2018-05-11SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
2018-04-23SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2018-04-19HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 47. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
2018-04-17HouseMade Special Order of the day No. 1 for 04/19/18.
2018-04-17HouseRead by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-16HouseReported with amendments (18-6).
2018-03-12HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=HB1&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073706
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086813
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088498
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088550
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095999
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099792
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086565
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1086564
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087832
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087902
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087956
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088620
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088596
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088539
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087955
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087903
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087760
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087154
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088665
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088698
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088675
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095938
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097039
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096927
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096808
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096773
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096771
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096770
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096767
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096766
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096765
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096570
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097044
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097040
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097031
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097029
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098635
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098609
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098993
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074051
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1074052
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1073707
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087189
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088799
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1099794
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088687
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1088699
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1097061
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1098633
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1101448

Bill Comments

feedback