KY SR220 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - adopted 34-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm the reappointment of Marcus S. Carey to the Kentucky Claims Commission for a term expiring September 30, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION confirming the reappointment of Marcus S. Carey to the Kentucky Claims Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1320 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12Senateadopted 34-0
2020-03-11Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 12, 2020
2020-03-10Senatereported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
2020-03-04Senateto Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S)
2020-03-02Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback