KY SR207 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - passed 38-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Confirm the reappointment of David Lee Harris to the Board of Trustees of the Kentucky Retirement Systems for a term expiring June 17, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION confirming the reappointment of David Lee Harris to the Board of Trustees of the Kentucky Retirement Systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1073 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28Senatepassed 38-0
2019-03-28Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2019
2019-03-28Senateto Senate Floor
2019-03-14Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback