KY SR196 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - adopted 35-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-30 - adopted 35-1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm the appointment of Angela C. Hatton to the Public Service Commission for a term expiring July 1, 2025.
Title
A RESOLUTION confirming the appointment of Angela C. Hatton to the Public Service Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Adopt RSN# 2813 (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | adopted 35-1 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2023 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-03-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |