KY SR144 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the United States Department of Transportation and the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to reconsider the recent federal requirements for the certification of commercial driver's license holders.
Title
A RESOLUTION urging the United States Department of Transportation and the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration to reconsider the recent federal requirements for the certification of commercial driver's license holders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2022-03-03 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 04, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-02-25 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/sr144.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/sr144/orig_bill.pdf |