KY SR13 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Lewis L. "Tee" Phelps.
Title
Adjourn in honor and loving memory of Lewis L. "Tee" Phelps.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2018-01-04 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2018-01-02 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SR13.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SR13/bill.pdf |