KY SJR44 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 081)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Direct the Transportation Cabinet to designate Interstate 471 in the Commonwealth in honor and memory of former U.S. Senator and Major League Baseball Hall of Famer Jim Bunning.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A JOINT RESOLUTION designating honorary names for various roads and bridges and directing the placement of honorary roadside signs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 985 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 315 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 852 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Senatesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 081)
2019-03-14Senatedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-14Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-14SenateBill passed 34-0
2019-03-14SenateSenate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) (2) and (3)
2019-03-14Senateposted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) (2) and (3) for Thursday, March 14, 2019
2019-03-13Senatereceived in Senate
2019-03-13House3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (1) (2) and (3)
2019-03-12Housefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-03-07Housefloor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-03-07Housetaken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
2019-03-06Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-03-06Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-06House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-05Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-28Houseposted in committee
2019-02-27Houseto Transportation (H)
2019-02-26Housereceived in House
2019-02-25Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-22Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2019-02-05Senateto Transportation (S)
2019-01-11Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback