KY SJR218 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 32)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Direct state agencies to conduct self-studies to examine practices that contribute to food waste and identify new practices that would reduce food waste and increase food donations to charitable feeding agencies; direct each agency to submit a written report of its findings to the IJC on Agriculture; direct the Finance and Administration Cabinet to develop food waste reduction guidelines to be used by all state agencies and to present those guidelines to the IJC on Agriculture.
Title
Direct state agencies to conduct self-studies to examine practices that contribute to food waste and identify new practices that would reduce food waste and increase food donations to charitable feeding agencies; direct each agency to submit a written report of its findings to the IJC on Agriculture; direct the Finance and Administration Cabinet to develop food waste reduction guidelines to be used by all state agencies and to present those guidelines to the IJC on Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 32) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 87-0 |
2018-03-15 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-03-12 | House | posted in committee |
2018-03-09 | House | to Agriculture (H) |
2018-03-07 | House | received in House |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 6, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/18RS/SJR218.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/18RS/SJ218/bill.pdf |