KY SJR140 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Public Service Commission to make all staffing, organizational, and administrative preparations necessary to be ready to discharge its regulatory duties relating to applications for the siting and construction of nuclear energy facilities in the Commonwealth, including but limited to conducting a survey of nuclear regulatory staff in other states, contracting with personnel with expertise in nuclear regulatory matters to be available to assist immediately with any nuclear siting or construction applications that may be filed with the commission, providing for the training of existing staff on nuclear siting and construction issues, amending the administrative regulations promulgated by the commission to require that electric utilities consider all generation resources, including nuclear resources, when developing their triennial integrated resource plans, and reviewing all other administrative regulations promulgated by the commission to ensure that there are no impediments to the effective regulation of nuclear facilities or any obstructions to the development of the nuclear ecosystem in the Commonwealth.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION directing the Public Service Commission to make all staffing, organizational, and administrative preparations necessary to be ready to discharge its regulatory duties relating to applications for the siting and construction of nuclear energy facilities in the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 329 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Adopt RSN# 2937 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Adopt RSN# 2937 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | signed by Governor |
2024-03-25 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-25 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2024-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-27 | House | received in House |
2024-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 34-0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 26, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-14 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Energy
Environment and Conservation
Nuclear Energy
Public Utilities
State Agencies
Energy
Environment and Conservation
Nuclear Energy
Public Utilities
State Agencies