KY SCR142 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Early Childhood Education Task Force to conduct a comprehensive review of the early childhood caregiving and educational structures and operations in the Commonwealth; outline task force membership; require the task force to meet monthly during the 2022 interim; and require the task force to submit findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2022.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Early Childhood Education Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Adopt RSN# 2118 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-03-14 | House | received in House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | adopted 35-0 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2022-03-03 | Senate | reassigned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2022-02-25 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-23 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Legislative Research Commission
Occupations and Professions
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Legislative Research Commission
Occupations and Professions
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch