KY SB99 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor Acts Ch. 102)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor Acts Ch. 102)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 242.1243 to remove sunset provision for local option elections for distilleries; amend KRS 243.0305 to allow distillery gift shops to sell products that were produced in collaboration with a brewer or microbrewer; amend KRS 243.120 to establish minimum production amounts for distillery licensees.
Title
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1494 (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 383 (Y: 63 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 354 (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1, scta 1 RSN# 1181 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 383 (Y: 63 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 354 (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1, scta 1 RSN# 1181 (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Senate | signed by Governor Acts Ch. 102) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-15 | Senate | passed 27-5 |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-04-15 | House | passed 63-23 |
2020-04-15 | House | House receded from floor amendments (2) and (3) |
2020-04-15 | House | posted for passage for receding from House floor amendments (2) and (3) |
2020-04-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-04-15 | House | to Rules (H) |
2020-04-15 | House | received in House |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House floor amendments (2) and (3) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (2) and (3) |
2020-04-14 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2020-04-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 65-23 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendments (2) and (3) |
2020-04-14 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-04-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-03-19 | House | floor amendments (3) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-18 | House | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-17 | House | posting waived |
2020-03-17 | House | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-03-17 | House | 1st reading |
2020-03-17 | House | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | received in House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 27-7 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-01-30 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2020-01-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 30, 2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-01-28 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-01-28 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | introduced in Senate |