KY SB98 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 110)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 209 to require entities that provide personal care services to vulnerable adults to query the Cabinet for Health and Family Services as to whether a prospective employee, contractor, or volunteer has been the subject of a validated substantiated finding of adult abuse, neglect, or exploitation; allow queries for current employees, contractors, and volunteers; allow an individual to query the cabinet to determine whether a validated substantiated finding of adult abuse, neglect, or exploitation has been entered against him or her; make false queries a criminal violation; require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to implement the query process in a secure manner.
Title
AN ACT relating to adult abuse, neglect, and exploitation.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gregory [R] | Sen. Walter Blevins [D] | Sen. Perry Clark [D] | Sen. Julie Denton [R] |
Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Christian McDaniel [R] | Sen. Morgan McGarvey [D] | Sen. Reginald Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 110) |
2014-03-31 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-31 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-31 | Senate | passed 36-0 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute |
2014-03-31 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute for Monday, March 31, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-21 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-21 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-20 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-19 | House | posting waived |
2014-03-19 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-24 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-02-21 | House | received in House |
2014-02-20 | Senate | passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2014-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 20, 2014 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-06 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-02-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-01-28 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | introduced in Senate |