KY SB97 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 11)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 11)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 159.010 to permit, beginning with the 2014-2015 school year, each local board of education, on the recommendation of the superintendent and approval of the Kentucky Department of Education, to require children residing in the school district's attendance area to attend school until the child has reached his or her eighteenth birthday except as provided in KRS 159.030; amend KRS 159.020 to conform; make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT relating to compulsory attendance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 11) |
2013-03-12 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-12 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2013-03-11 | Senate | passed 33-5 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute |
2013-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute |
2013-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | passed 88-10 with Committee Substitute |
2013-03-11 | House | floor amendment (1) defeated |
2013-03-11 | House | 3rd reading |
2013-03-11 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2013-03-11 | House | taken from Rules |
2013-03-07 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2013-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2013-03-04 | House | posting waived |
2013-03-04 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | 2nd reading |
2013-03-04 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2013-03-01 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2013-03-01 | House | 1st reading |
2013-03-01 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2013-02-25 | House | to Education (H) |
2013-02-22 | House | received in House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-2 with floor amendment (1) |
2013-02-20 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2013-02-20 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2013-02-19 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2013-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2012 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-02-07 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |