KY SB96 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - posted in committee
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 214 to define terms; establish authority and standards for permitting expedited partner therapy for a sexually transmitted gonorrhea or Chlamydia infecton.
Title
AN ACT relating to permitting expedited partner therapy for a sexually transmitted gonorrhea or chlamydia infection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1 RSN# 823 (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-22 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | received in House |
2019-02-20 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 20, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |