KY SB94 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 42)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 42)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 164.787 to add eligibility for the Work Ready Kentucky Scholarship Program to students with intellectual disabilities enrolled in comprehensive transition and postsecondary programs.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Work Ready Kentucky Scholarship Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2178 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 304 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1994 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 304 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1994 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 42) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2022-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2022-03-22 | Senate | passed 38-0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2022-03-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2022-03-16 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-03-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-07 | House | to Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H) |
2022-02-02 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-02 | House | received in House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | moved to the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 02, 2022 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 03, 2022 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 03, 2022 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-01-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-21 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-19 | Senate | introduced in Senate |