KY SB94 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - returned to Health and Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Repeal KRS 217.950, 217.952, 311.950, 311.952, 311.954, 311.956, 311.958, 311.960, 311.962, 311.964, 311.966, 311.991, and 315.192, relating to laetrile.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to laetrile.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-07Housereturned to Health and Family Services (H)
2017-03-07House1st reading
2017-03-07Housetaken from Health and Family Services (H)
2017-02-15Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2017-02-13Housereceived in House
2017-02-13Senate3rd reading, passed 34-0
2017-02-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 13, 2017
2017-02-09Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2017-02-08Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2017-01-07Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2017-01-05Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback