KY SB94 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-26 - returned to Agriculture & Small Business (H)
Pending: House Agriculture and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 376 to establish a livestock seller's lien in favor of a livestock seller when the seller does not receive payment for the livestock within three days of delivery; describe the property of the lien to which the lien attaches; deem the lien a purchase money security interest; declare the lien effective the day the livestock is delivered; provide that the lien is perfected by filing a financing statement within 45 days, or within 20 days to have purchase money security interest priority; establish priority consistent with Article 9 of the Uniform Commercial Code and a pro rata share in the same collateral for multiple lien holders; allow a buyer in the ordinary course of business to take free of the lien; allow enforcement of the lien according to Part 6 of the Uniform Commercial Code.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-26 returned to Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2012-03-26 1st reading
2012-03-26 taken from Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2012-02-02 to Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2012-02-01 received in House
2012-01-31 3rd reading, passed 32-3 with Committee Substitute
2012-01-30 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 31, 2012
2012-01-27 2nd reading, to Rules
2012-01-26 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2012-01-11 to Agriculture (S)
2012-01-10 introduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback