KY SB94 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 261.220 to clarify actions that the Commissioner of Agriculture may employ to enforce Chapter 261 of the Kentucky Revised Statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to agriculture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2011-03-02 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2011
2011-03-02 reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2011-03-01 returned to Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2011-03-01 2nd reading
2011-03-01 taken from Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2011-02-28 returned to Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2011-02-28 1st reading
2011-02-28 taken from Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2011-02-22 posting waived
2011-02-22 to Agriculture & Small Business (H)
2011-02-18 received in House
2011-02-17 3rd reading, passed 34-1 with Committee Substitute
2011-02-17 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2011
2011-02-17 reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2011-02-15 returned to Agriculture (S)
2011-02-15 2nd reading
2011-02-15 taken from Agriculture (S)
2011-02-14 returned to Agriculture (S)
2011-02-14 1st reading
2011-02-14 taken from Agriculture (S)
2011-02-03 to Agriculture (S)
2011-02-01 introduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback