KY SB9 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on January 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Passed on January 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 311 to prohibit a person from denying or depriving a born-alive infant of nourishment with the intent to cause or allow the death of the infant; prohibit a person from denying or depriving a born-alive infant of medically appropriate and reasonable medical care, medical treatment, or surgical care; require a physician performing an abortion to take all medically appropriate and reasonable steps to preserve the life and health of a born-alive infant; specify that if the physician is unable to perform those duties then an attending physician assistant, advanced practice registered nurse, nurse, or other healthcare worker shall assume the duties; provide that a born-alive infant shall be treated as a legal person under the laws of the Commonwealth; specify that any born-alive infant, whose parents file a petition for voluntary termination of parental rights, shall become a ward of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services; specify that this section shall not be construed as preventing a born-alive infant's parent or guardian from refusing medical care that is not medically appropriate or reasonable; specify that the parent or guardian of a born-alive infant shall not be held criminally or civilly liable for the actions of a physician, physician assistant, advanced practice registered nurse, or other healthcare provider that acted without his or her consent; provide for civil and administrative penalties for violations of this Act; allow for severability; allow the General Assembly by joint resolution to appoint members to intervene as a matter or right in any case that challenges the constitutionality of this Act; amend KRS 311.595, 311.850, 314.091, and 315.121 to suspend or revoke the license of any physician, physician assistant, advanced practice registered nurse, nurse, or pharmacist who violates this Act; amend KRS 311.990 to establish criminal penalties for violations; establish the short titles of "Born-Alive Infant Protection Act" and "Avacyn Act"; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the protection of born-alive infants and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 22 (Y: 76 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1499 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1499 (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2021-01-22 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 1) |
2021-01-09 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2021-01-09 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2021-01-09 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2021-01-09 | Senate | received in Senate |
2021-01-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 76-18 |
2021-01-08 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for January 9, 2021 |
2021-01-08 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-01-07 | House | posted in committee |
2021-01-07 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | 1st reading |
2021-01-07 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2021-01-07 | House | received in House |
2021-01-07 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 32-4 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 7, 2021 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules |
2021-01-05 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | 1st reading |
2021-01-05 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2021-01-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Children and Minors
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Local Mandate
Nurses
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Reproductive Issues
Short Titles and Popular Names
Women
Civil Actions
Civil Procedure
Corrections Impact
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Procedure
Effective Dates, Emergency
Health and Medical Services
Local Mandate
Nurses
Pharmacists
Physicians and Practitioners
Reproductive Issues
Short Titles and Popular Names
Women