KY SB9 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 337.010 to exclude the construction of educational buildings and facilities from the definition of "public works" and from meeting the requirements of the prevailing wage law.
Title
AN ACT relating to prevailing wage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-19 | House | to Labor & Industry (H) |
2016-01-15 | House | received in House |
2016-01-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 26-11 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 14 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |