KY SB88 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 204)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 204)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 6 to prohibit the General Assembly from imposing requirements on cities that require city expenditures or tax levies without fully funding the requirement or making the requirements contingent on city legislative body approval; exempt requirements that are the result of a federal mandate; ensure that the provisions do not affect the obligations under KRS 6.950 to 6.975.
Title
AN ACT relating to city mandates.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. Joe Bowen [R] | Sen. Jared Carpenter [R] |
Sen. Rick Girdler [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 502 (Y: 76 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1 RSN# 421 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 421 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SFA 1 RSN# 421 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 421 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 204) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2018-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2018-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-04-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-04-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 76-10 |
2018-02-28 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 1, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-02-15 | House | posted in committee |
2018-02-13 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2018-02-09 | House | received in House |
2018-02-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 8, 2018 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-24 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2018-01-18 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | introduced in Senate |