KY SB83 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 22)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 22)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 241.010 to define "commercial airport," "cider," "malt beverage," and "weak cider"; amend KRS 242.123 to delineate a reference to a special local option election in a city of the second class; amend KRS 243.030 to split the distiller's license into Class A and Class B licenses; amend KRS 243.033 to clarify that caterer's licenses may be used in limited restaurant moist territory and in the manner of an NQ4 drink license; amend KRS 243.042 to allow a qualified historic site to serve alcoholic beverages by the drink on a riverboat moored at its licensed premises; amend KRS 243.050 to add the holder of a license located in a commercial airport among those licensees who may be granted an extended hours supplemental license; amend KRS 243.072 and 243.075 to include county alcohol license fees and permit local regulatory license fees for limited restaurant territory or for a city of the third or fourth class under KRS Chapter 242; amend KRS 243.082 to clarify the duties and privileges of an NQ1 license; amend KRS 243.084 to authorize NQ2 retail drink licenses for hotel and restaurant dining facilities that seat at least 50 people and that derive at least 50% of their food and alcoholic beverage receipts from the sale of food; amend KRS 243.120 to assign a distiller's Class A license to distillers that produce more than 50,000 gallons of distilled spirits per year, and a distiller's Class B license to those that produce 50,000 gallons or less per year; amend KRS 243.200 to add the duties and privileges of a transporter's license; amend KRS 243.250, 244.125, and 244.295 to set the restaurant food threshold at 50% of food and beverage receipts rather than food and beverage income; amend KRS 243.320 to allow a nonbeverage alcohol licensee to produce, possess, and use alcohol in the manufacture of nonbeverage fuel ethanol; amend KRS 243.353 to make technical changes; amend KRS 243.360 to exempt an applicant for a micro out-of-state distilled spirits and wine supplier's license from the requirement to advertise the intention to apply for a license; amend KRS 244.290 and 244.480 to replace outdated terms; amend KRS 244.585 to compel a malt beverage distributor to file its territorial agreements only upon request of the department; amend KRS 243.034, 243.170, and 243.230 to conform; repeal KRS 243.083 and 243.205.
Title
AN ACT relating to alcoholic beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 22) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-21 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 52-38 |
2014-03-17 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-03-14 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2014-03-13 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 17, 2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-10 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-05 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | received in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 27-8 with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 3, 2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-01-17 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |