KY SB81 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-27 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 336.010 to define "contractor," "person," "prime contractor," "secretary," and 'subcontractor"; amend KRS 336.040 to require the Labor Cabinet to be the determining authority in issues related to employee misclassification; create a new section of KRS Chapter 336 to establish criteria for determining whether a person is an independent contractor, exempting a prime contractor for a subcontractor's misclassification of an employee, and exempting independent contractors from certain benefits; amend KRS 336.050 to require the secretary to develop a training program on classification of employees; amend KRS 336.990 to establish a penalty for misclassification of employees; amend KRS 342.640 to delete provisions relating to newspaper delivery persons.
Title
AN ACT relating to employee misclassification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 74-22 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-26 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-03-26 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-26 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-24 | House | returned to Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | 2nd reading |
2014-03-24 | House | taken from Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-03-20 | House | returned to Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-03-20 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-20 | House | taken from Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-03-07 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-05 | House | to Labor & Industry (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | received in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 24-14 with floor amendment (1) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-26 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-25 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-17 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | introduced in Senate |