KY SB80 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 101)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal and reenact or repeal, reenact, and amend various sections of KRS 421.500 to 421.575, the Crime Victim Bill of Rights, to change statutory definition of "victim"; require that restitution to the victim be made when possible; repeal KRS 421.540; EFFECTIVE November 3, 2020, only if voters ratify a proposed constitutional amendment providing protection of crime victims' rights.
Title
AN ACT relating to crime victims' rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 351 (Y: 81 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1274 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1274 (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 101) |
2020-04-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2020-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2020-04-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2020-04-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-8 |
2020-04-14 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2020-04-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2020-03-19 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-18 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | posting waived |
2020-03-09 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-03-05 | House | received in House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 29-2-1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2020-01-13 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |