KY SB8 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 10 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-10 - delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

amend KRS 158.441 to clarify the definition of "school resource officer"; amend KRS 158.4412 to allow the superintendent to specify any individual to serve as the district's school safety coordinator; amend KRS 158.4414 to clarify which facilities are required to have school resource officers and to require that school resource officers are armed with a firearm; amend KRS 158.4416 to specify that the goal is to have at least one school counselor per public school and to have at least one school counselor or school-based mental health services provider for every 250 students; amend KRS 61.902 to specify that the commission of a special law enforcement officer employed as a school resource officer shall be for four years; amend KRS 156.095 to specify that the Kentucky Department of Criminal Justice Training is to prepare an active shooter training video in consultation with the Department of Education; amend KRS 158.162 to include exceptions to locked classroom doors; amend KRS 508.078 to clarify when a person is guilty of terroristic threatening; amend KRS 16.128, 1.315, 70.062, and 95.970 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to school safety and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 86 (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Adopt HFA 3 RCS# 85 (Y: 28 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Adopt HFA 2 RCS# 84 (Y: 26 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1165 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-10Senatedelivered to Governor
2020-02-10Senateenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-02-10Senateenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-02-10Senatereceived in Senate
2020-02-07Housepassed 78-8
2020-02-07Housefloor amendments (2) and (3) defeated
2020-02-07House3rd reading
2020-02-05Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 6, 2020
2020-02-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-04Housefloor amendments (1), (2) and (3) filed
2020-02-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-30Houseposted in committee
2020-01-29Houseto Education (H)
2020-01-27Housereceived in House
2020-01-27Senatepassed 34-1
2020-01-27Senatefloor amendment (1) defeated
2020-01-27Senate3rd reading
2020-01-24Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January, 27, 2020
2020-01-23Senatefloor amendment (1) filed
2020-01-23Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2020-01-16Senatereturned to Education (S)
2020-01-16Senate2nd reading
2020-01-16Senatetaken from Education (S)
2020-01-15Senateto Education (S)
2020-01-15Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2020-01-15Senate1st reading
2020-01-15Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2020-01-13Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback