KY SB8 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - posted in committee
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - posted in committee
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 12.015 to require the Finance and Administration Cabinet to develop an annual financial report on all administrative bodies and deliver the report to the Legislative Research Commission, the Program Review and Investigation Committee, and the Secretary of State; require that any administrative body established by executive order shall expire 180 days after the end of the term of office of the Governor, unless the administrative body has been established in statutes; require that any administrative body established by administrative order shall expire within 180 days after the term of Office of the Governor whose appointee created the administrative body; require the Office of the Governor to report on existing administrative bodies established by executive or administrative order by August 31, 2012; grant the Governor the authority to dissolve any administrative body; Require the Office of the Governor to report to the Legislative Research Commission by July 1, 2013, on all of the existing administrative bodies that are deemed to be necessary for the effective functioning of state government and explain why each is necessary; prohibit the establishment of any new administrative body by executive or administrative order for one year from the effective date of this Act.
Title
AN ACT relating to administrative bodies of state government.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | posted in committee | |
2012-03-19 | to State Government (H) | |
2012-03-16 | received in House | |
2012-03-15 | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 | |
2012-03-14 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 15, 2012 | |
2012-03-13 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2012-03-07 | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2012-03-05 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2012-03-05 | 1st reading | |
2012-03-05 | taken from Committee on Committees (S) | |
2012-03-05 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB8.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB8/bill.doc |