KY SB8 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 14 to require the Secretary of State to establish a business-one-stop electronic state business portal to facilitate interaction among businesses and governmental agencies in the Commonwealth, to mandate that certain elements be included in the development of the business portal, to coordinate with appropriate cabinet to develop certain aspects of the business portal, and to have the basics of the business portal operational by July 1, 2012; Amend KRS 11.202 to require the Commission on Small Business Advocacy to submit an annual report beginning December 1, 2012 to LRC and the Secretary of State with an analysis of how to improve the business-one-stop portal so that it is more user friendly; amend KRS 42.730 to direct the executive director of the Commonwealth Office of Technology to conduct research regarding the various technical and filing requirements necessary for the successful development of the business portal, to submit a report to the Legislative Research Commission no later than December 31, 2011; make an appropriation to the Commonwealth Office of Technology for a study; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to a one-stop-shop to conduct business in the Commonwealth and making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-04 | passed 37-0 | |
2011-03-04 | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2011-03-04 | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2011-03-03 | received in Senate | |
2011-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2011-02-28 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 1, 2011 | |
2011-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2011-02-23 | posting waived | |
2011-02-01 | to Economic Development (H) | |
2011-01-07 | received in House | |
2011-01-06 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2011-01-05 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, Janaury 6, 2011 | |
2011-01-05 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2011-01-04 | returned to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2011-01-04 | 1st reading | |
2011-01-04 | taken from Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2011-01-04 | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB8.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB8/bill.doc |